Summary: H.R.4446 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/16/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act to extend: (1) the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission through September 30, 2019 (currently September 30, 2018), or at an earlier date determined by the commission after submitting its final report to Congress; and (2) the final reporting date from January 31, 2018, to January 31, 2019.