There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ACCESS Act
Authorizing Critical Conservation and Enabling Sportsmen and Sportswomen Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the preservation of America's outdoor heritage and enhance recreation opportunities on Federal land, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
12/21/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
12/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/30/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources11/30/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans12/05/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands12/05/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology11/30/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment05/22/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary11/30/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture11/30/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry12/21/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/30/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment12/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4489. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/30/2017)

Authorizing Critical Conservation and Enabling Sportsmen and Sportswomen Act or the ACCESS Act

This bill revises, reauthorizes, and establishes programs and entities regarding the conservation of wildlife and expanded access to hunting, fishing, and recreational shooting on federal lands.

The bill makes permanent the authorizations for: (1) the program for the sale and exchange of public lands identified for disposal under approved land use plans, and (2) the Land and Water Conservation Fund.

The bill revises requirements for appointment to the Board of Directors of the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation and reauthorizes the foundation through FY2022.

This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the Partners for Fish and Wildlife Program and the multinational species conservation funds.

The Department of the Interior shall convene a panel of experts on great apes to identify the greatest needs and priorities for their conservation.

Certain federal departments and agencies shall implement activities to protect water and wildlife to control invasive species on the lands which they manage.

The bill establishes Theodore Roosevelt Genius Prize competitions regarding wildlife related concerns.

The bill establishes the National Fish Habitat Board and provides for the designation of Fish Habitat Partnerships by it.

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

The bill amends the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to facilitate the construction and expansion of public target ranges.

The bill declares that federal lands shall be open to hunting, fishing, and recreational shooting, unless closed in accordance with this bill.