There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Synthetic Drug Awareness Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Synthetic Drug Awareness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To require the Surgeon General of the Public Health Service to submit to Congress a report on the health effects of new psychoactive substances (including synthetic drugs) use.

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Surgeon General of the Public Health Service to submit to Congress a report on the effects on public health of the increased rate of use of synthetic drugs.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
01/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/13/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
06/12/2018-2:29pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2018-2:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5029)
06/12/2018-2:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/12/2018-2:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 449.
06/12/2018-2:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5029-5031)
06/12/2018-2:12pmHouseMr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/25/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
01/25/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/11/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/11/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/09/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/17/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/21/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/21/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/24/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/27/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/27/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/28/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/06/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/06/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/27/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/29/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/02/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/26/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/27/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/29/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 06/29/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/29/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/10/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/13/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/13/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/13/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/26/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/27/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/28/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/06/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/26/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/12/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 12/19/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/13/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/09/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/22/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/01/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/11/2017 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2017 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.449. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2017)

Synthetic Drug Awareness Act of 2017

This bill requires the Surgeon General to report to Congress on the public health effects of the increased use since January 2010 by individuals who are 12 to 18 years old of drugs developed and manufactured to avoid control under the Controlled Substances Act (e.g., synthetic marijuana, also known as "spice," and synthetic amphetamines, also known as "bath salts").