There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Accountability and Hush Fund Elimination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to prohibit the use of public funds to pay awards and settlements in connection with claims under such Act which arise from sexual harassment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
11/30/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/30/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 12/01/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 12/01/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 12/01/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/01/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 12/01/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/01/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 12/01/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 12/01/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 12/05/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 12/05/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/05/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 12/05/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/05/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 12/05/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/05/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 12/05/2017
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/12/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/12/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/12/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/12/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 12/13/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 12/13/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 12/13/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/13/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 12/13/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/13/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/13/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/13/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/20/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 12/20/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/20/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/20/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/10/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/10/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/10/2018
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 01/10/2018
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 01/10/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 01/10/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/29/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/29/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Committee on House Administration11/30/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4494. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/30/2017)

Congressional Accountability and Hush Fund Elimination Act

This bill amends the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 (CAA) to (1) prohibit the use of public funds for payments of awards and settlements resulting from violation of certain CAA rights and protections if the violation consists of sexual harassment or sexual assault, (2) prohibit an imposition of a nondisclosure agreement as a prerequisite for CAA procedures to consider the violation, and (3) permit an individual to publicize any information relating to such a prior award or settlement if it was conditioned on a nondisclosure agreement.