There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Bears Ears National Monument Expansion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand the boundaries of the Bears Ears National Monument, to ensure prompt engagement with the Bears Ears Commission and prompt implementation of the Proclamation establishing the Bears Ears National Monument, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/01/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 12/01/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 12/01/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/01/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 12/01/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/07/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 12/07/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/07/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 12/07/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/07/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 12/07/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/07/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/07/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/07/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/07/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/07/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/07/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/07/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/07/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/07/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/07/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 12/07/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 12/07/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/07/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/07/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 12/14/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/14/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/14/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/14/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/14/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/14/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/14/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/14/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/14/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/14/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/14/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/14/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/14/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/14/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 12/14/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/14/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/14/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/14/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/14/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/14/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/14/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/14/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/14/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 12/14/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/14/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/14/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 12/14/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/14/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 12/14/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 12/14/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 12/14/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/14/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/14/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/21/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/21/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/21/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/21/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/21/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 12/21/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/21/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/21/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/21/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/21/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 12/21/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 12/21/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/21/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/21/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/08/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/30/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 01/30/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/30/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/30/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/30/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/30/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/30/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/30/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/30/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 01/30/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/30/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/30/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/08/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/20/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/09/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/25/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/08/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/08/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/12/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/19/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/10/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/10/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/16/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/25/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/01/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands12/07/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4518.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4518. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/01/2017)

Bears Ears National Monument Expansion Act

This bill expands the boundaries of the Bear Ears National Monument in Utah.

The Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture USDA shall administer the lands under their jurisdictions within the expanded boundaries: (1) as part of the monument; and (2) in accordance with Presidential Proclamation 9558, dated December 28, 2016, which provided for establishment of the monument.

Interior and USDA shall promptly carry out the proclamation's provisions, including the provisions requiring them to engage the Bear Ears Commission to:

  • ensure the proper care and management of the objects identified;
  • ensure that management decisions affecting the monument reflect tribal expertise and traditional and historical knowledge; and
  • provide guidance and recommendations on the development and implementation of management plans and on management of the monument.

The National Park Service shall administer Natural Bridges National Monument and those portions of Glen Canyon National Recreation Area that are within the expanded boundaries as part of the monument.

Interior and USDA may acquire lands, waters, or interests in land that are located within the revised boundaries of the monument by donation, purchase, or exchange.