There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Shash Jaa National Monument and Indian Creek National Monument Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To create the first Tribally managed national monument, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/30/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
01/09/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
12/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 12/04/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/04/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands12/11/2017 Referred to
01/30/2018 Hearings by

As of 12/16/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4532 - Shash Jaa National Monument and Indian Creek National Monument Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4532. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/04/2017)

Shash Jaa National Monument and Indian Creek National Monument Act

This bill withdraws all federal lands and interests within the exterior boundaries of the Bears Ears National Monument in Utah as declared under Presidential Proclamation 9558, dated December 28, 2016, from:

  • entry, appropriation, and disposal under the public land laws;
  • location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and
  • operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws.

The bill declares that such proclamation is null and void.

The bill establishes the Shash Jaa National Monument (consisting of approximately 142,337 acres) and the Indian Creek National Monument (consisting of approximately 86,447 acres), to be managed by the Shash Jaa Tribal Management and Indian Creek Management Councils, respectively.

The previously established Bears Ears Commission shall advise the councils.

The councils shall establish resources protection units to help conserve unique and nationally important historic, sacred, cultural, scientific, scenic, archaeological, natural, and educational resources within their respective monument.

Such monuments are withdrawn from:

  • entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws;
  • location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and
  • operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws.

The Department of the Interior and the Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration shall enter into an exchange of federal and state trust lands, at the completion of which the state trust lands shall be added to the Shash Jaa or the Indian Creek National Monument.