There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the health care system of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Lexington VA Health Care System" and to make certain other designations.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
03/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-132. (TXT | PDF)
03/09/2018Signed by President.
02/28/2018Presented to President.
02/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1191)
02/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 70).(text: CR H1081-1082)
12/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-132. (TXT | PDF)
03/09/2018Signed by President.
02/28/2018HousePresented to President.
02/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/15/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1191)
02/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
02/13/2018-6:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/13/2018-6:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 70). (text: CR H1081-1082)
02/13/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1103-1104)
02/13/2018-3:46pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/13/2018-3:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4533.
02/13/2018-3:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1081-1083)
02/13/2018-3:31pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 12/04/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs12/04/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health12/04/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4533.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4533. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-132 (03/09/2018)

(Sec. 2) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs: (1) health care system in Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Lexington VA Health Care System," (2) health care facility at 1101 Veterans Drive, Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Troy Bowling Campus," and (3) health care facility at 2250 Leestown Road, Lexington, Kentucky, as the "Franklin R. Sousley Campus."