There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

CHAMPION KIDS Act of 2017
Continuing Community Health and Medical Professional Programs to Improve Our Nation and Keep Insurance Delivery Stable Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend funding for certain public health programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/04/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/04/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (126)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/04/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/05/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/05/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/05/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/05/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/05/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/05/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 12/05/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/05/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/05/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/05/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 12/06/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/06/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/06/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/06/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 12/06/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/06/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/06/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 12/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/06/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/06/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/06/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/06/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 12/06/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 12/07/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/07/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/07/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/07/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/07/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/07/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/07/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 12/07/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/07/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 12/11/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/11/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/11/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/11/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/11/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/11/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 12/11/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/11/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/11/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/11/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/11/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 12/11/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/11/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/11/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/12/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/12/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/13/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/13/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 12/13/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 12/13/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/13/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/13/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/13/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/13/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/13/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/13/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/14/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/14/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/14/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/14/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/14/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/14/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/15/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 12/15/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/15/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/15/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 12/15/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/15/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/15/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/15/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/15/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 12/15/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/15/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/15/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/15/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/15/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/15/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 12/15/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/18/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/18/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/18/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/18/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 12/18/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 12/18/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/19/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/19/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/19/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/19/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/19/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/19/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/19/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/19/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/20/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/20/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 12/20/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 12/20/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 12/21/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/21/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/22/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/22/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/03/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/09/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/04/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/08/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means12/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4541. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/04/2017)

Continuing Community Health and Medical Professional Programs to Improve Our Nation and Keep Insurance Delivery Stable Act of 2017 or the CHAMPION KIDS Act of 2017

This bill extends funding for the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP), community health centers, and other specified public health programs, and otherwise modifies provisions related to Medicaid, CHIP, and public health.