There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Financial Institutions Examination Fairness and Reform Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Financial Institutions Examination Fairness and Reform Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Financial Institutions Examination Fairness and Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council Act of 1978 to improve the examination of depository institutions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/15/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 283 - 133 (Roll no. 112).
03/06/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-589.
12/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
03/19/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
03/15/2018-4:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/15/2018-4:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 283 - 133 (Roll no. 112).
03/15/2018-4:04pmHouseH.Amdt.534 On agreeing to the Waters, Maxine amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 184 - 233 (Roll no. 111).
03/15/2018-3:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1642-1643)
03/15/2018-2:16pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Maxine Waters amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Waters demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/15/2018-2:15pmHouseThe previous question was ordered on the amendment and the bill without objection.
03/15/2018-2:09pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 773, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Waters Part B amendment No. 1.
03/15/2018-2:08pmHouseH.Amdt.534 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Waters, Maxine. (consideration: CR H1633-1634; text: CR H1633)
03/15/2018-1:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4545.
03/15/2018-1:12pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545, H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545 under a structured rule, and makes in order amendments printed in the report, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263 under closed rules. The rule provides for one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Minority Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
03/15/2018-1:12pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 773. (consideration: CR H1624-1634; text of measure as reported in House: CR H1624-1625)
03/15/2018-1:12pmHouseORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Hensarling asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting amendment No. 1 printed in Part B of House Report 115-595 to H.R.4545 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20. Agreed to without objection.
03/13/2018-6:45pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 773 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545, H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545 under a structured rule, and makes in order amendments printed in the report, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263 under closed rules. The rule provides for one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Minority Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
03/06/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 447.
03/06/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-589.
12/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 10.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
12/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services12/04/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
03/06/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-589
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/15/2018)

Financial Institutions Examination Fairness and Reform Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council Act of 1978 to apply specified procedures related to reporting and review, as established by the bill, to a nondepository covered person that is subject to Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) supervision.

(Sec. 3) The bill sets deadlines for final examination reports and exit interviews of a financial institution by a federal financial regulatory agency.

(Sec. 4) The Office of Independent Examination Review is established to adjudicate appeals and investigate complaints from financial institutions concerning examination reports.

(Sec. 5) Financial institutions have the right to an independent review of a material supervisory determination. The bill also establishes a limited review by the Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council (FFIEC) if there is evidence that the final decision reached by the office would pose an imminent threat to the financial institution's safety and soundness. Certain retaliatory actions by regulatory agencies with respect to such review are prohibited. 

(Sec. 6) The bill also requires the establishment of an independent internal agency appellate process at the CFPB for the review of supervisory determinations made at institutions supervised by the CFPB. The proportion of FFIEC costs covered by regulatory agencies is raised.

(Sec. 7) The bill amends the Federal Reserve Act to lower the maximum allowable amount of surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks.