There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Strengthening Protections for Social Security Beneficiaries Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Protections for Social Security Beneficiaries Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Protections for Social Security Beneficiaries Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Strengthening Protections for Social Security Beneficiaries Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles II, VIII, and XVI of the Social Security Act to improve and strengthen the representative payment program.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
04/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-165. (TXT | PDF)
04/13/2018Signed by President.
04/03/2018Presented to President.
03/23/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1982)
03/23/2018Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/05/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 51).(text: CR H741-746)
12/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-165. (TXT | PDF)
04/13/2018Signed by President.
04/03/2018HousePresented to President.
03/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/23/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1982)
03/23/2018SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/06/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
02/05/2018-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2018-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 51). (text: CR H741-746)
02/05/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H762-763)
02/05/2018-4:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/05/2018-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4547.
02/05/2018-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H741-749)
02/05/2018-4:01pmHouseMr. Brady (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/05/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
12/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 12/05/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/11/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/11/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/11/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/11/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 12/12/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/13/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 12/13/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/13/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/14/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 12/15/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/15/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 12/18/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/18/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 12/18/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/20/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 12/20/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/03/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/03/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/03/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/03/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/05/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/05/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/08/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/08/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/08/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/08/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/08/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/09/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/09/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/09/2018
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/10/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/10/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/10/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/10/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 01/10/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/12/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 01/12/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/12/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/12/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/16/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/17/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/17/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/17/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/17/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 01/17/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/18/2018
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 01/19/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 01/19/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 01/19/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/19/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/19/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/19/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/19/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/22/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/22/2018
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/22/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/25/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 01/25/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 01/29/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/29/2018
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 01/30/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/02/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 02/02/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/05/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/05/2017 Referred to
Senate Finance02/06/2018 Referred to
03/23/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4547. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-165 (04/13/2018)

Strengthening Protections for Social Security Beneficiaries Act of 2018

TITLE I--STRENGTHENING OVERSIGHT AND BENEFICIARY PROTECTION

(Sec. 101) This bill requires the Social Security Administration (SSA) to make annual grants to each state's protection and advocacy system for the purpose of conducting reviews of representative payees under the Supplemental Security Income (SSI) program and the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance (OASDI) program. The SSA must also conduct periodic onsite reviews of individual and organizational payees.

(Sec. 102) The bill lessens certain monitoring requirements with respect to specified family members who are serving as representative payees.

(Sec. 103) The SSA must: (1) enter into agreements with each state for the purpose of sharing information to identify represented minor beneficiaries who are in foster care; and (2) determine the appropriate representative payee for any represented minor beneficiary who has entered foster care, exited foster care, or changed foster care placement in a given month.

The Government Accountability Office must report to specified congressional committees on certain issues related to represented minor beneficiaries in foster care.

(Sec. 104) The bill modifies provisions related to overpayment liability with respect to a represented minor beneficiary in foster care.

(Sec. 105) The SSA must report to specified congressional committees on certain issues related to representative payment with respect to SSI and OASDI benefits.

TITLE II--IMPROVING PAYEE SELECTION AND QUALITY

(Sec. 201) The bill provides for advance designation of representative payees.

(Sec. 202) In general, an individual who has been convicted of a felony, or of an attempt or a conspiracy to commit a felony, may not serve as a representative payee.

(Sec. 203) An individual who has a representative payee may not also serve as a representative payee.