There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Reforming Disaster Recovery Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Reforming Disaster Recovery Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to provide disaster assistance to States and units of general government under a community development block grant disaster recovery program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/28/2018Committee on Transportation discharged.
12/22/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on 115-1107, Part I.
12/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 870.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Transportation discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/22/2018Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure for a period ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the juridiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(r) of rule X.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/22/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on 115-1107, Part I.
06/07/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 3.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/07/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/05/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/05/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/28/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 06/28/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/28/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services12/05/2017 Referred to
06/07/2018 Markup by
12/22/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1107
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/22/2018 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4557.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4557. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/05/2017)

Reforming Disaster Recovery Act of 2017

This bill provides statutory authority for certain procedures related to the Community Development Block Grant Disaster Recovery Program and adds new program requirements, including with respect to coordination of benefits, precertification for grant assistance, and allocation of grant funds.