There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Grand Staircase Escalante Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide greater conservation, recreation, economic development and local management of Federal lands in Garfield and Kane Counties, Utah.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/14/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
12/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3]* 12/06/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/06/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands12/07/2017 Referred to
12/14/2017 Hearings by

As of 12/14/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4558 - Grand Staircase Escalante Enhancement Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4558. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2017)

Grand Staircase Escalante Enhancement Act

This bill establishes the Escalante Canyons National Park and Preserve within the Escalante Canyons National Monument (established by this bill and consisting of approximately 243,241 acres) in Utah.

Federal lands within the park and preserve, including lands or interests acquired by the United States afterwards, are withdrawn from:

  • entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws;
  • location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and
  • operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws.

The bill also establishes the Grand Staircase National Monument (consisting of approximately 211,983 acres) and the Kaiparowits National Monument (consisting of approximately 551,117 acres).

A management council shall implement comprehensive management plans for the park and preserve and the monuments. Federal land managers must adhere to the management plans created by the council.

The public lands excluded from the lands and interests in lands reserved within the modified boundaries of the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument under the Presidential Proclamation dated December 4, 2017, shall be open to:

  • entry, location, selection, sale, or other disposition under the public land laws;
  • disposition under all laws related to mineral and geothermal leasing; and
  • location, entry, and patent under the mining laws.

Interior shall convey to the state of Utah the Hole in the Rock Road (BLM [Bureau of Land Management] Road 200).