There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Violence Research Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify that the Dickey Amendment does not prevent the use of funds for research on mental health, gun violence, and how they intersect, and to provide for reporting on the effects of gun violence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 12/06/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/07/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/12/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 12/14/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/14/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/14/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/23/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/23/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/23/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/26/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/06/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/06/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/06/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 04/25/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4573. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2017)

Gun Violence Research Act of 2017

This bill amends the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2016, with respect to the prohibition on the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) using funds to advocate or promote gun control. The bill declares that this prohibition does not restrict HHS funding for research on mental health, gun violence, and how they intersect.

The Surgeon General must report annually on the effects of gun violence on public health, including mental health, and the status of actions taken to address those effects. HHS must report on the effects of gun violence on public health in minority communities.