There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Access to Independent Health Insurance Advisors Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act to preserve consumer and employer access to licensed independent insurance producers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
12/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 12/06/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/09/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/17/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/18/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/19/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/19/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/29/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/29/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/29/2018
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/29/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/29/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/29/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 01/30/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/05/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/06/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/06/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/15/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/27/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/27/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/27/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/06/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/06/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/13/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/19/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/20/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/11/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/11/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/12/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/12/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/07/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 05/07/2018
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/07/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/06/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/10/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4575. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/06/2017)

Access to Independent Health Insurance Advisors Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to exclude remuneration paid for licensed independent insurance producers from administrative costs for purposes of calculating the medical loss ratio of a health insurance plan.

The bill defines "independent insurance producer" to mean an insurance agent or broker, insurance consultant, benefit specialist, limited insurance representative, and any other person required to be licensed under state law to sell, solicit, negotiate, service, effect, procure, renew, or bind policies of insurance coverage or offer advice, counsel, opinions, or services related to insurance.