There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Trafficking Survivors Relief Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the vacating of certain convictions and expungement of certain arrests of victims of human trafficking.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/11/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/11/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/11/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/13/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/27/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/13/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 05/18/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/18/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/18/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/19/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/06/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/06/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/13/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/18/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/04/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/11/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.459. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2017)

Trafficking Survivors Relief Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to establish a process to vacate convictions and expunge arrests for criminal offenses committed by trafficking victims that directly result from or relate to having been a trafficking victim.

A trafficking victim may file a motion: (1) to vacate a conviction for a nonviolent offense that does not include a child victim (i.e., under age 18); (2) to expunge records of an arrest for a nonviolent offense that does not include a child victim; or (3) to expunge records of an arrest for an offense that is violent or that includes a child victim, if the charges are reduced, dismissed, or disposed of.