There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Fort Ontario Study Act

Other Short Titles

Fort Ontario Study Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fort Ontario Study Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Fort Ontario Study Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fort Ontario Study Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Fort Ontario Study Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of Fort Ontario in the State of New York.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-255. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018Presented to President.
09/25/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H8861)
09/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6258-6259)
06/14/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-110.
01/30/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H712)
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-255. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018HousePresented to President.
09/25/2018-9:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-9:20pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H8861)
09/25/2018-9:20pmHouseMr. McClintock asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8861)
09/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/18/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6258-6259)
06/14/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 147.
06/14/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-110.
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/31/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
01/30/2017-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/30/2017-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H712)
01/30/2017-4:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 46.
01/30/2017-4:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H712-713)
01/30/2017-4:44pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/30/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H712-713)
01/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 01/03/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/07/2017 Referred to
03/30/2017 Markup by
06/14/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-110

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.46. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-255 (10/09/2018)

Fort Ontario Study Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of Fort Ontario in Oswego, New York.

Interior shall: (1) evaluate the fort's national significance, and (2) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating it as a unit of the National Park System.