There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Receiving Electronic Statements To Improve Retiree Earnings Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Employee Retirement and Income Security Act of 1974 and the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the electronic delivery of pension plan information.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/11/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 12/11/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 12/11/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/19/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/20/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/20/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/03/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/08/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/12/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/16/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/30/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/30/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 06/12/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 07/11/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce12/11/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means12/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4610. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/11/2017)

Receiving Electronic Statements To Improve Retiree Earnings Act

This bill amends the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) and the Internal Revenue Code to authorize the electronic delivery of pension plan documents required to be furnished to a plan participant, beneficiary, or other individual.

The system for furnishing such a document must: (1) be designed to result in effective access to the document, (2) permit the recipient to select the electronic means through which the document is received or request paper documents, and (3) protect the confidentiality of personal information.

An annual paper notice must be provided describing:

  • the selection of electronic means for furnishing documents,
  • the right to modify the selection or to elect to receive paper versions of the documents at no additional direct cost and how to make the election, and
  • any election that has been made to receive paper documents.

An electronically furnished document must be prepared and furnished in a manner that is consistent with the style, format, and content requirements for the document. It must also include a notice that apprises the individual of the significance of the document when it is not otherwise reasonably evident as transmitted.