There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Employer Relief Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for a temporary moratorium on the employer mandate and to provide for a delay in the implementation of the excise tax on high cost employer-sponsored health coverage.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/28/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-906.
12/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
08/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 702.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/28/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-906.
07/11/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/11/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
12/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/12/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/14/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/26/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means12/12/2017 Referred to
07/11/2018 Markup by
08/28/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-906

No related bill information was received for H.R.4616.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4616. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/12/2017)

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to suspend the employer mandate for health insurance coverage until January 1, 2019.

The bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to delay for one year, until after December 31, 2020, the implementation of the excise tax on high cost employer-sponsored health coverage (commonly referred to as the Cadillac tax).