Text: H.R.4616 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (08/28/2018)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 4616 Reported in House (RH)]

<DOC>





                                                 Union Calendar No. 702
115th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 4616

                          [Report No. 115-906]

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for 
  a temporary moratorium on the employer mandate and to provide for a 
  delay in the implementation of the excise tax on high cost employer-
                       sponsored health coverage.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           December 12, 2017

 Mr. Nunes (for himself and Mr. Kelly of Pennsylvania) introduced the 
 following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means

                            August 28, 2018

Additional sponsors: Mr. Messer, Mr. Meadows, and Mr. Smith of Nebraska

                            August 28, 2018

  Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole 
       House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed
 [Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed 
                               in italic]
    [For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on 
                           December 12, 2017]


_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for 
  a temporary moratorium on the employer mandate and to provide for a 
  delay in the implementation of the excise tax on high cost employer-
                       sponsored health coverage.


 


    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Employer Relief Act of 2018''.

SEC. 2. MORATORIUM ON EMPLOYER MANDATE.

    Section 4980H of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by 
adding at the end the following new subsection:
    ``(e) Suspension.--This section shall not apply to any month 
beginning after December 31, 2014, and before January 1, 2019.''.

SEC. 3. DELAY IN IMPLEMENTATION OF EXCISE TAX ON HIGH COST EMPLOYER-
              SPONSORED HEALTH COVERAGE.

    Section 9001(c) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act 
is amended by striking ``December 31, 2021'' and inserting ``December 
31, 2022''.
                                                 Union Calendar No. 702

115th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                               H. R. 4616

                          [Report No. 115-906]

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide for 
  a temporary moratorium on the employer mandate and to provide for a 
  delay in the implementation of the excise tax on high cost employer-
                       sponsored health coverage.

_______________________________________________________________________

                            August 28, 2018

  Reported with an amendment, committed to the Committee of the Whole 
       House on the State of the Union, and ordered to be printed

Share This