There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase the number of peer-to-peer counselors providing counseling for women veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H5137)
05/18/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-687.
12/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/13/2018-4:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2018-4:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H5137)
06/13/2018-4:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4635.
06/13/2018-4:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5137-5138)
06/13/2018-4:44pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 530.
05/18/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-687.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/17/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
12/13/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs12/13/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-687
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health12/13/2017 Referred to
04/17/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/14/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4635. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/13/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to emphasize appointing peer support counselors for women veterans. The VA shall recruit women peer support counselors with expertise in gender-specific issues and services, VA services and benefits, and employment mentoring.

The VA shall:

  • emphasize peer support counseling for women veterans who suffered sexual trauma while in the Armed Forces, have post-traumatic stress disorder or another mental health condition, are homeless, or are at risk of suicide;
  • conduct program outreach;
  • coordinate with community, business, educational, and state and local government entities; and
  • provide peer support counselor training.