There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to John L. Canley for acts of valor during the Vietnam War while a member of the Marine Corps.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/29/2018Became Private Law No: 115-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/29/2018Signed by President.
01/17/2018Presented to President.
01/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S170)
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10362)
12/21/2017Committee on Armed Services discharged.
12/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
01/29/2018Became Private Law No: 115-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/29/2018Signed by President.
01/17/2018HousePresented to President.
01/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/11/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S170)
12/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/21/2017-2:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2017-2:29pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10362)
12/21/2017-2:28pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10362)
12/21/2017HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
12/21/2017-2:28pmHouseMr. Coffman asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/14/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
12/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
12/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services12/13/2017 Referred to
12/21/2017 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel12/14/2017 Referred to

As of 12/16/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4641 - To authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to John L. Canley for acts of valor during the Vietnam War while a member of the Marine Corps..


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4641. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/13/2017)

The President may award the Medal of Honor to John L. Canley for his acts of valor during the Vietnam War as a member of the Marine Corps, for which he was previously awarded the Navy Cross.