Text: H.R.4641 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Private Law (01/29/2018)

 
[115th Congress Private Law 1]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 1]]

Private Law 115-1
115th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to John L. Canley 
 for acts of valor during the Vietnam War while a member of the Marine 
             Corps. <<NOTE: Jan. 29, 2018 -  [H.R. 4641]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. AUTHORIZATION FOR AWARD OF MEDAL OF HONOR TO JOHN L. 
                              CANLEY FOR ACTS OF VALOR DURING THE 
                              VIETNAM WAR.

    (a) Waiver of Time Limitations.--Notwithstanding the time 
limitations specified in section 6248 of title 10, United States Code, 
or any other time limitation with respect to the awarding of certain 
medals to persons who served in the Armed Forces, the President may 
award the Medal of Honor under section 6241 of such title to John L. 
Canley for the acts of valor during the Vietnam War described in 
subsection (b).
    (b) Acts of Valor Described.--The acts of valor referred to in 
subsection (a) are the actions of then Gunnery Sergeant John L. Canley 
during combat operations from January 31, 1968, to February 6, 1968, 
during the Vietnam War as a member of the Marine Corps, for which he was 
previously awarded the Navy Cross.

    Approved January 29, 2018.