There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Recovering America's Wildlife Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to make supplemental funds available for management of fish and wildlife species of greatest conservation need as determined by State fish and wildlife agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
02/15/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
12/20/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/20/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/14/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/14/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (116)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 12/14/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/21/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/10/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/18/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/18/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 01/18/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/15/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/15/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/15/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/15/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/15/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/15/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/15/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/15/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/15/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/15/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/15/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/15/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/15/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/15/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/15/2018
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 03/15/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/15/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/15/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/15/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/15/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/15/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/15/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 03/22/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/22/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/22/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/22/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/11/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 04/11/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/11/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 04/11/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/11/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/11/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/09/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2018
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 05/09/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/09/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/09/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/09/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/09/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/18/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/18/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 05/18/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 05/18/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/06/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/06/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/06/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/14/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/14/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/14/2018
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/19/2018
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/19/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/22/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/22/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/22/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/16/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/16/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/16/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/19/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 07/19/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 08/03/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/06/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/06/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 09/06/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/06/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 09/13/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/13/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/13/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/13/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/13/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 09/13/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/28/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/28/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/28/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/28/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/28/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/05/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/05/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/05/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/26/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/26/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/26/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/26/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/26/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 10/26/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/30/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/30/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/12/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/12/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/20/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/14/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands12/20/2017 Referred to
02/15/2018 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans12/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4647. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/14/2017)

Recovering America's Wildlife Act

This bill amends the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to direct the Department of the Treasury to transfer, beginning in FY2018, revenues from energy and mineral development on federal lands totaling $1.3 billion to the Wildlife Conservation and Restoration Subaccount of the Federal Aid to Wildlife Restoration Fund, to be available without further appropriation.

The bill revises the requirements governing how the funds from the subaccount may be used, including by requiring funds to be used to develop, revise, and implement state wildlife conservation strategies. The bill expands the allowable uses of the subaccount, including by allowing funds to be used for managing invasive and nuisance species and for law enforcement activities that are directly related to the conservation of species of the greatest conservation need.

Funds apportioned from the subaccount may not be conditioned upon the provision of public access to private lands, waters, or holdings.

The bill specifies what types of funds and donations states may use to meet matching fund requirements.

The bill revises the formula used to determine how funds are distributed to states.