There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

CREEPER Act of 2017
Curbing Realistic Exploitative Electronic Pedophilic Robots Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

CREEPER Act of 2017
Curbing Realistic Exploitative Electronic Pedophilic Robots Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit the importation or transportation of child sex dolls, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
12/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
06/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/13/2018-2:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2018-2:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5119-5120)
06/13/2018-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4655.
06/13/2018-2:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5119-5121)
06/13/2018-2:22pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/22/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/14/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
12/14/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary12/14/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/22/2018 Referred to
Senate Judiciary06/14/2018 Referred to

As of 09/21/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4655 - CREEPER Act of 2017.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.