There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Further Additional Supplemental Appropriations for Disaster Relief Requirements, 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, for disaster assistance for Hurricanes Harvey, Irma, and Maria, and calendar year 2017 wildfires, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 251 - 169 (Roll no. 709).(text: CR H10364-10385)
12/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
01/04/2018SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
01/03/2018SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
12/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/21/2017-5:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2017-5:02pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 251 - 169 (Roll no. 709). (text: CR H10364-10385)
12/21/2017-4:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10403-10404)
12/21/2017-3:52pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 8 of rule 20, further consideration of H.R. 4667 was postponed.
12/21/2017-3:51pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
12/21/2017-2:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4667.
12/21/2017-2:48pmHouseOn question of consideration of the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
12/21/2017-2:48pmHouseQUESTION OF CONSIDERATION - The Chair announced that the bill contained an emergency designation pursuant to section 4(g)(1) of the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 and accordingly, the Chair would put the question of consideration under section 4(g)(2) of the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.
12/21/2017-2:46pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 670. (consideration: CR H10364-10394)
12/18/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/18/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/18/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations12/18/2017 Referred to
House Budget12/18/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (121)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4667. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/18/2017)

DIVISION A--DISASTER ASSISTANCE

Further Additional Supplemental Appropriations for Disaster Relief Requirements, 2017

This division provides $81 billion in FY2018 emergency appropriations to several federal agencies for disaster assistance related to Hurricanes Harvey, Irma, and Maria; and wildfires that occurred in 2017. (Emergency spending is exempt from discretionary spending limits and other budget enforcement rules.)

DIVISION B--DISASTER RECOVERY REFORM ACT

This division amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to modify the Federal Emergency Management Agency disaster response and recovery programs.

DIVISION C--OTHER MATTERS

This division amends the Agricultural Act of 2014 to designate cottonseed as a covered commodity beginning with the 2018 crop year. (Producers of covered commodities are eligible for Department of Agriculture [USDA] price and income support programs such as the Price Loss Coverage program.)

It also amends the Federal Crop Insurance Act to remove the $20 million cap on annual expenditures for livestock producers under the federal crop insurance program.

The bill requires all states to participate in USDA's National Accuracy Clearinghouse, which is a database for states to use to prevent Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program) participants from receiving duplicative benefits in multiple states. (The clearinghouse is currently a pilot program with five participating states.)

DIVISION D--BUDGETARY EFFECTS

This division exempts the budgetary effects of division B and each succeeding division of this bill from Pay-As-You-Go (PAYGO) and other budget enforcement rules.