There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VA Scheduling Accountability Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

VA Scheduling Accountability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Scheduling Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to ensure that each medical facility of the Department of Veterans Affairs complies with requirements relating to scheduling veterans for health care appointments, to improve the uniform application of directives of the Department, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 278).(text: CR 5/23/2017 H4467)
05/23/2017Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/23/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-149, Part I.
01/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
05/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/24/2017-2:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/24/2017-2:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 278). (text: CR 5/23/2017 H4467)
05/24/2017-1:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4527-4528)
05/23/2017-3:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/23/2017-3:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 467.
05/23/2017-3:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4467-4468)
05/23/2017-3:06pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/23/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 97.
05/23/2017HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/23/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-149, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/22/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/22/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/12/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/23/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-149
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Hearings by
04/06/2017 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity02/03/2017 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform01/12/2017 Referred to
05/23/2017 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.467. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

VA Scheduling Accountability Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that each VA medical facility annually certifies that it is in full compliance with all provisions of law and regulations relating to scheduling appointments for veterans hospital care and medical services. The VA may not waive any applicable provision of such laws or regulations.

If unable to make such certification, the facility shall provide the VA with an explanation of noncompliance and a description of compliance actions being taken. If a facility does not make a certification for any year, each covered official may not receive specified awards or bonuses during the subsequent year. A covered official is the: (1) director, (2) chief of staff, (3) associate director, (4) associate director for patient care, and (5) deputy chief of staff.

(Sec. 3) The VA shall ensure that its directives and policies apply to, and are implemented by, each VA office or facility in a standardized manner, including at the local level.