There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2017
Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to provide for a low-dose radiation basic research program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1090)
02/13/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-554.
12/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
02/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/13/2018-4:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/13/2018-4:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1090)
02/13/2018-4:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4675.
02/13/2018-4:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1090-1092)
02/13/2018-4:30pmHouseMr. Marshall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/13/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 416.
02/13/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-554.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
01/10/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
01/10/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
12/18/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
12/18/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/18/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/18/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 12/18/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 02/13/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology12/18/2017 Referred to
01/10/2018 Markup by
02/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-554
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2018 Referred to

As of 10/21/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4675 - Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2018.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4675. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/13/2018)

Low-Dose Radiation Research Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Energy to carry out a research program on low-dose radiation to enhance the scientific understanding of the effects of exposure and to improve risk-assessment and risk-management methods.

"Low-dose radiation" is defined as a dose less than 100 millisieverts. (The Nuclear Regulatory Commission limits an adult's annual occupational radiation dose to 50 millisieverts.)