There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Foreign Spill Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 to impose penalties and provide for the recovery of removal costs and damages in connection with certain discharges of oil from foreign offshore units, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/13/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/13/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/23/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/30/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/03/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/03/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/06/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/17/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/19/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/22/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/23/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/02/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/02/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/06/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/06/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/06/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/07/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/07/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/13/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 06/20/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/21/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/21/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/21/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/23/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/26/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/26/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/27/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/12/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment01/13/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation01/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.468. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/12/2017)

Foreign Spill Protection Act of 2017

This bill amends the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 to make foreign facilities that are located offshore and outside the exclusive economic zone (EEZ) liable for removal costs and damages that result from oil spills that reach (or threaten to reach) U.S. navigable waters, adjoining shorelines, or the EEZ. Specifically, the following parties may be held liable: (1) the owners or operators of the foreign facilities, including facilities located in, on, or under any land within foreign countries; and (2) the holders of a right of use and easement granted under applicable foreign law for the area in which the facility is located.