There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ensuring Access to Quality Sober Living Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Access to Quality Sober Living Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to identify or facilitate the development of best practices for operating recovery housing, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the Center for Substance Abuse Treatment of the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration, to publish and disseminate best practices for operating a recovery housing, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
12/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/13/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
06/12/2018-3:04pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2018-3:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5036)
06/12/2018-3:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/12/2018-2:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4684.
06/12/2018-2:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5036-5038)
06/12/2018-2:51pmHouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/17/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/25/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
12/22/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/19/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
12/19/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/19/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/22/2017 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions06/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4684. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/19/2017)

Ensuring Access to Quality Sober Living Act of 2017

This bill requires the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to publish best practices for operating recovery housing, to distribute such publication to the states, and to provide technical assistance to states seeking to adopt such practices. "Recovery housing" means a shared living environment free from alcohol and illegal drug use and centered on peer support and connection to services to promote recovery from substance use disorders.