There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Music Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to provide clarity and modernize the licensing system for musical works under section 115 and to ensure fairness in the establishment of certain rates and fees under sections 114 and 115 of such title, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
12/21/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/08/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/08/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 01/11/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 01/11/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/18/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/18/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/18/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 01/18/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/29/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/29/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/29/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/29/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/29/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/29/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/30/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 01/30/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/30/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/02/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/02/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/02/2018
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/02/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 02/02/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/02/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 02/06/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/06/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/08/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/08/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/08/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/13/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 02/13/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/13/2018
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 02/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 02/14/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/15/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/23/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/05/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/05/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/05/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/06/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/07/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/15/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/15/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 03/19/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/20/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/05/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/05/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/12/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/18/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/24/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary12/21/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4706. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/21/2017)

Music Modernization Act of 2017

This bill amends the copyright law to create a statutory blanket license for making and distributing nondramatic musical sound recordings, including through digital delivery. The blanket license allows digital music services to distribute sound recordings covered by the license without negotiating for the rights for each individual recording, as long as the music service complies with the license's requirements, such as paying the required royalties.