There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

340B PAUSE Act
340B Protecting Access for the Underserved and Safety-net Entities Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a moratorium on the registration of certain new 340B hospitals and associated sites, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
12/22/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/21/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/02/2018
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/17/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/15/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce12/21/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/22/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4710.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4710. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/21/2017)

340B Protecting Access for the Underserved and Safety-net Entities Act or the 340B PAUSE Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to suspend for two years the registration of certain hospitals in the 340B drug pricing program, which requires drug manufacturers to offer discounts on outpatient drugs to registered health care entities.

The bill requires certain registered hospitals to report to the Department of Health and Human Services specified information, including the number of individuals receiving discounted drugs and associated costs.