There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Defending U.S. Government Communications Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Government from using or contracting with an entity that uses certain telecommunications services or equipment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/09/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/09/2018Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 01/09/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/10/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/10/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/12/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 01/16/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/16/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/16/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/16/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/16/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/18/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/22/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/30/2018
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/07/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/08/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/13/2018
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/14/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 02/14/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/14/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 02/14/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/14/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 02/14/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/14/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/14/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/14/2018
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/16/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/20/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/23/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/23/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/23/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/27/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 02/27/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/01/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 03/06/2018
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/07/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/14/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/15/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/15/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/05/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/09/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/10/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/10/2018
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/10/2018
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/11/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 04/11/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/11/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/03/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform01/09/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4747. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2018)

Defending U.S. Government Communications Act

This bill prohibits federal agencies from procuring or obtaining, renewing or extending a contract to obtain or procure, or entering into a contract with an entity that uses any equipment, system, or service with telecommunications equipment or services as a substantial or essential component of any system that is from Huawei Technologies Company, ZTE Corporation, or an entity reasonably believed to be owned or controlled by China.