There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Bank Holding Company Relief Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Bank Holding Company Relief Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Bank Holding Company Relief Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To raise the consolidated assets threshold under the small bank holding company policy statement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/08/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 139 (Roll no. 66).(text of Amendment in nature of a substitute: CR H983)
02/02/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-543.
01/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/12/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
02/08/2018-4:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/08/2018-4:44pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 139 (Roll no. 66). (text of Amendment in nature of a substitute: CR H983)
02/08/2018-4:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H995)
02/08/2018-12:16pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 4771, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Hensarling demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
02/08/2018-12:15pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/08/2018-12:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed debate on H.R. 4771.
02/08/2018-11:09amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4771.
02/08/2018-11:07amHouseThe resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution also waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of February 9, 2018. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of February 8, 2018 or February 9, 2018 for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules.
02/08/2018-11:07amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 725. (consideration: CR H983-990; text of amendment in nature of a substitute: CR H983)
02/06/2018-11:42amHouseRule H. Res. 725 passed House.
02/05/2018-7:23pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 725 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution also waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of February 9, 2018. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of February 8, 2018 or February 9, 2018 for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules.
02/02/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 408.
02/02/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-543.
01/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 14.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
01/11/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/11/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/11/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/11/2018 Referred to
01/17/2018 Markup by
01/18/2018 Markup by
02/02/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-543
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4771. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/08/2018)

Small Bank Holding Company Relief Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Federal Reserve Board (FRB) to revise its Small Bank Holding Company Policy Statement on Assessment of Financial and Managerial Factors (which allows smaller bank companies to have higher debt levels than are generally allowed). Specifically, the FRB must raise the consolidated asset threshold at which the statement applies from $1 billion to $3 billion.