There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FAIR Act
Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase the rates of pay under the statutory pay systems and for prevailing rate employees by 3 percent, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/11/2018Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/11/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 01/11/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/11/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/11/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/16/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/16/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/29/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/29/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/29/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/07/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/07/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/13/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/13/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/13/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/13/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/13/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/13/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/14/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/14/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/26/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/26/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/27/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/15/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/19/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/18/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/17/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/18/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/22/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/11/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4775. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/11/2018)

Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act or the FAIR Act

This bill increases by 3% the rates of basic pay for federal employees under the statutory pay systems (i.e., the General Schedule, the Foreign Service Schedule, and various schedules related to the Veterans Health Administration) for calendar year 2019.

Additionally, it increases by 3% the rates of basic pay for prevailing rate employees for FY2019.