There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Volcker Rule Regulatory Harmonization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Volcker Rule Regulatory Harmonization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Volcker rule to give the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System sole rulemaking authority, to exclude community banks from the requirements of the Volcker rule, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 300 - 104 (Roll no. 139).(text: CR H3214-3215)
04/05/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-621.
01/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
04/16/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
04/13/2018-10:48amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/13/2018-10:48amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 300 - 104 (Roll no. 139). (text: CR H3214-3215)
04/13/2018-10:19amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/13/2018-9:10amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4790.
04/13/2018-9:08amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4790 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Also, the rule provides for motions to suspend the rules relating to H.J. Res. 2 on the legislative day of April 12, 2018.
04/13/2018-9:08amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 811. (consideration: CR H3214-3223)
04/11/2018-2:16pmHouseRule H. Res. 811 passed House.
04/10/2018-6:46pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 811 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4790 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Also, the rule provides for motions to suspend the rules relating to H.J. Res. 2 on the legislative day of April 12, 2018.
04/05/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 474.
04/05/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-621.
03/21/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 10.
03/21/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/12/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/12/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/05/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 04/05/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/05/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/12/2018 Referred to
03/21/2018 Markup by
04/05/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-621
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4790. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/13/2018)

Volcker Rule Regulatory Harmonization Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Bank Holding Company Act of 1956 to grant exclusive rulemaking authority under the Volcker Rule to the Federal Reserve Board. (Currently, the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, the Securities and Exchange Commission, and the Commodity Futures Trading Commission also have regulatory authority under the Volcker Rule. The Volcker Rule prohibits banking agencies from engaging in proprietary trading or entering into certain relationships with hedge funds and private-equity funds.)

(Sec. 4) The bill exempts from the Volcker Rule banks with total assets: (1) of $10 billion or less, and (2) comprised of 5% or less of trading assets and liabilities.