There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Business Access to Capital After a Natural Disaster Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Access to Capital After a Natural Disaster Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to expand access to capital for small businesses affected by hurricanes or other natural disasters, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/29/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H654)
01/29/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-529.
01/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
01/30/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
01/29/2018-7:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2018-7:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H654)
01/29/2018-7:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4792.
01/29/2018-7:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H654-655)
01/29/2018-7:07pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/29/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 394.
01/29/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-529.
01/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
01/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/12/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/12/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/16/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 01/16/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/16/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/12/2018 Referred to
01/18/2018 Markup by
01/29/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-529
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/30/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4792. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/29/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Small Business Access to Capital After a Natural Disaster Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to require the Advocate for Small Business Capital Formation within the Securities and Exchange Commission to report on issues encountered by small businesses affected by hurricanes or other natural disasters.