There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

USA Act of 2018
Uniting and Securing America Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide relief from removal and adjustment of status of certain individuals who are long-term United States residents and who entered the United States before reaching the age of 18, improve border security, foster United States engagement in Central America, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
01/26/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
01/24/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/16/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 01/16/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/16/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/16/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/16/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/17/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/17/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/18/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/22/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/26/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/27/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/27/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/27/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/16/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security01/24/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security01/16/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security01/26/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce01/16/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/16/2018 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/16/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (64)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4796. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/16/2018)

Uniting and Securing America Act of 2018 or the USA Act of 2018

This bill provides conditional permanent resident status for an alien meeting specified requirements, including having entered the United States when younger than 18 years old and residing in the United States since December 31, 2013.

An individual may apply to have such conditional basis removed after meeting specified eligibility requirements.

The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall cancel the removal of, and adjust to the status of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence on a conditional basis, an individual who was granted Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) status, unless such individual has engaged in disqualifying conduct.

The bill repeals provisions that deny an unlawful alien eligibility for higher education benefits on the basis of residence within a state unless a U.S. citizen or national is eligible for such benefits without regard to whether such citizen or national is such a resident.

DHS shall: (1) deploy the most practical and effective technology available in order to achieve situational awareness and operational control along the U.S. border; (2) submit to Congress a comprehensive southern border strategy to achieve border control; and (3) begin eradicating the carrizo cane plant and salt cedar along the Rio Grande River.

DHS may construct new ports of entry along the northern and southern borders.

The bill establishes Operation Stonegarden in DHS to provide border security grants to law enforcement agencies in border or maritime border states that are involved in U.S. Customs and Border Protection operations

DHS shall establish a two-year grant program to improve emergency communications in the southern border region for individuals who are at risk of violence and lack cellular and LTE network service.

The number of immigration judges is increased.

The President shall designate a senior official to coordinate federal and international efforts to strengthen citizen security, the rule of law, and economic prosperity in Central America.