There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GOOD Act
Guidance Out Of Darkness Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

GOOD Act
Guidance Out Of Darkness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

GOOD Act
Guidance Out Of Darkness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase access to agency guidance documents.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9072)
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-972.
01/16/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586.
09/26/2018-7:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9072)
09/26/2018-7:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4809.
09/26/2018-7:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9072-9073)
09/26/2018-7:03pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 760.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-972.
03/15/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/15/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/16/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/16/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/13/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/14/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/16/2018 Referred to
03/15/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-972

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4809. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2018)

Guidance Out Of Darkness Act or the GOOD Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires an agency to: (1) publish guidance documents online on the dates they are issued, (2) publish all of its guidance documents that are in effect in a single location on an online portal designated by the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), and (3) display a hyperlink on the agency's online portal that provides access to the guidance documents.

The documents must be identified as guidance documents, sorted into subcategories, published in a machine-readable and open format, and searchable.

On the date a guidance document is rescinded, an agency must add an indication on the online portal designated by OMB that the guidance document is rescinded and the date on which it was rescinded.

OMB must designate an online portal within 30 days.