There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing Our Schools Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for grants from the Attorney General to local education agencies to purchase and install devices that would allow for the immediate notification of appropriate officials in case of emergency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/05/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/18/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/18/2018Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H482)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/08/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 02/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/26/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 02/26/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/27/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 02/27/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 02/27/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/27/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/27/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/01/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/01/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/01/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/01/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/01/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 03/01/2018
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/01/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/06/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/06/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/06/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/06/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/06/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/06/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/06/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/07/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/07/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/07/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/07/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/07/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/07/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/08/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 03/08/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/08/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/08/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/08/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/08/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 03/08/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/08/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/08/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 03/08/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/08/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/09/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/09/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/09/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 03/09/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/13/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/14/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 03/14/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/12/2018
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/17/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education04/05/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary01/17/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/18/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4811.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2018)

Securing Our Schools Act of 2018

This bill establishes a pilot program under which the Department of Justice may award one-year grants to local education agencies for the purpose of purchasing and installing devices that allow for the immediate notification of appropriate officials in case of emergency.