There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Marijuana Justice Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for a new rule regarding the application of the Act to marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
02/08/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/07/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/24/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/17/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/17/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/18/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/18/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 01/18/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 01/18/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/22/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/07/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/29/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/17/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 04/24/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/26/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/26/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/26/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/26/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/15/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/07/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/04/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/26/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/20/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/20/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/17/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/07/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/17/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/19/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture01/17/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry02/08/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/17/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands01/24/2018 Referred to
House Financial Services01/17/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4815. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/17/2018)

Marijuana Justice Act of 2018

This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act:

  • to remove marijuana and tetrahydrocannabinols from schedule I; and
  • to eliminate criminal penalties for an individual who imports, exports, manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute marijuana.

It prohibits and reduces certain federal funds for a state without a statute legalizing marijuana, if the Bureau of Justice Assistance determines that such a state has a disproportionate arrest rate or disproportionate incarceration rate for marijuana offenses.

The bill directs federal courts to expunge convictions for marijuana use or possession.

Finally, it establishes in the Treasury the Community Reinvestment Fund. Amounts in the fund may be used by the Department of Housing and Urban Development to establish a grant program to reinvest in communities most affected by the war on drugs.