There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

DELTA Act
Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DELTA Act
Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DELTA Act
Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

DELTA Act
Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DELTA Act
Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote inclusive economic growth through conservation and biodiversity programs that facilitate transboundary cooperation, improve natural resource management, and build local capacity to protect and preserve threatened wildlife species in the greater Okavango River Basin of southern Africa.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-353. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7950)
11/29/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
07/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6312-6313)
01/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-353. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7950)
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 704.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
11/28/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/17/2018-4:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2018-4:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6312-6313)
07/17/2018-4:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4819.
07/17/2018-4:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6312-6315)
07/17/2018-4:17pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/22/2018HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
05/22/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/22/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/18/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/18/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/18/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/02/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/02/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/07/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/26/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/26/2018
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/26/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/09/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/09/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/09/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/09/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/09/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/09/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 05/18/2018
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/18/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/18/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/18/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/18/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/21/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/21/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/21/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/22/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 05/22/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/22/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/22/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 07/16/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/18/2018 Referred to
05/22/2018 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations07/18/2018 Referred to
11/28/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4819. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-353 (12/21/2018)

Defending Economic Livelihoods and Threatened Animals Act or the DELTA Act

This bill directs the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development to work with Angola, Botswana, Namibia, and neighboring countries to develop a strategy to: (1) promote responsible natural resource and wildlife management practices in the greater Okavango River Basin, (2) protect migration routes of elephants and other threatened wildlife species, (3) combat wildlife poaching and trafficking, (4) address local health needs, and (5) catalyze economic growth. The strategy shall also involve partnerships with donors, the private sector, and local, regional, and nongovernmental entities.