There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ASK Act
Advancing Seniors and Kids Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • KIDS Act
  • Keeping Kids' Insurance Delivery Stable Act
  • Strengthening Protections for Social Security Beneficiaries Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend funding for certain public health programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/23/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/18/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/18/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/19/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/19/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/19/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 01/19/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/19/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/22/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/22/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/22/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/22/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/22/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/22/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/30/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/30/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/30/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/30/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/30/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/30/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/30/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 01/30/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/30/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/30/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/30/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/30/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/30/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/05/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/05/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/05/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/05/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/15/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/18/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/19/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/18/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/23/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4820. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/18/2018)

Advancing Seniors and Kids Act or the ASK Act

This bill extends, and otherwise revises, various public health and social welfare programs. Specifically, the bill:

  • permanently extends the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP);
  • extends by one year, but reduces by half, additional federal financial participation for CHIP;
  • extends CHIP's qualifying-states option, express-lane eligibility option, and outreach and enrollment program;
  • extends the Child Enrollment Contingency Fund, the Childhood Obesity Demonstration Project, and the Pediatric Quality Measures Program;
  • modifies Medicare payment rules and reporting requirements with respect to ground-ambulance services;
  • permanently extends specialized Medicare Advantage (MA) plans for certain special-needs individuals;
  • expands certain supplemental benefits under MA for chronically ill enrollees;
  • extends the Medicare payment adjustment known as the "home-health rural add-on";
  • makes permanent or extends other specified programs and payment rules under Medicare;
  • under Medicaid, extends certain health workforce demonstration projects as well as specified programs related to community health centers, diabetes, graduate medical education, family-to-family health-information centers, abstinence education, and personal-responsibility education;
  • delays certain changes, under Medicaid, to disproportionate-share hospital allotments and to third-party liability provisions;
  • extends the Maternal, Infant, and Early Childhood Home Visiting Program and requires, under the program, continued demonstration of improvements in certain benchmark areas;
  • establishes a grant program for the monitoring of representative payees under the Supplemental Security Income (SSI) program and the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance (OASDI) program;
  • otherwise revises provisions related to representative payment under SSI and OASDI; and
  • with respect to the child-welfare system, modifies provisions related to information sharing and to overpayment liability.