There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SIT-REP Act
Servicemembers Improved Transition through Reforms for Ensuring Progress Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

SIT-REP Act
Servicemembers Improved Transition through Reforms for Ensuring Progress Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SIT-REP Act
Servicemembers Improved Transition through Reforms for Ensuring Progress Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the disapproval of any course of education for purposes of the educational assistance programs of the Department of Veterans Affairs unless the educational institution providing the course permits individuals to attend or participate in courses pending payment by Department, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 0 (Roll no. 207).(text: CR H4254-4255)
05/21/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-694.
01/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 0 (Roll no. 207). (text: CR H4254-4255)
05/21/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4267)
05/21/2018-3:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/21/2018-3:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4830.
05/21/2018-3:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4254-4256)
05/21/2018-3:41pmHouseMr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/21/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 537.
05/21/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-694.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/11/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/11/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/20/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
01/18/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/18/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/18/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/18/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/21/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-694
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity01/18/2018 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/11/2018 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4830. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/18/2018)

Servicemembers Improved Transition through Reforms for Ensuring Progress Act or the SIT-REP Act

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to require educational institutions, in order to be eligible for educational payments, to adopt policies that prohibit penalizing student veterans for late VA assistance payments.

Such policies shall: (1) permit a veteran who provides the institution with a certificate of VA assistance eligibility to attend courses for a period without VA payment; and (2) ensure that the educational institution will not impose penalties such as late fees, course denial, or requiring an individual to borrow additional funds because of delayed VA payments.