There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Job TOOLS for Veterans Act
Job Training through Off-Base Opportunities and Local Support for Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the pilot program on off-base transition training for veterans and spouses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/11/2018Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/11/2018Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/20/2018Committee Hearings Held.
01/19/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/18/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2018Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/18/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/22/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/19/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/18/2018 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity01/18/2018 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/11/2018 Reported by
House Armed Services01/18/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.