There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Safety Employer-Employee Cooperation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide collective bargaining rights for public safety officers employed by States or their political subdivisions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/19/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/05/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/19/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/19/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/19/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/14/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/14/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/14/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 02/14/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/14/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 02/14/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/14/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/23/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/23/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/23/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/23/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/05/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/05/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/06/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/06/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/07/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/08/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/13/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 03/13/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/19/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/19/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/26/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/11/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/13/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/13/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 04/18/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/26/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 04/26/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/07/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/15/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/15/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/18/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/07/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/20/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/20/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/26/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/10/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/16/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/18/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/26/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 08/24/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 09/13/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/25/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/25/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/06/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/19/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions04/05/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4846. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/19/2018)

Public Safety Employer-Employee Cooperation Act

This bill requires the Federal Labor Relations Authority to determine whether a state substantially provides public safety officers or employees:

  • the right to form and join a labor organization;
  • recognition by public safety employers of the employees' labor organization, agreement to bargain with the organization, and reduction of any agreements to writing in a contract or memorandum of understanding;
  • the right to bargain over hours, wages, and terms and conditions of employment; and
  • binding interest arbitration to resolve an impasse in collective bargaining negotiations.

The bill makes the authority responsible for: (1) determining the appropriateness of units for labor representation; (2) supervising elections; (3) conducting hearings and resolving complaints of unfair labor practices; and (4) protecting the right of employees to form, join, or assist any labor organization, or to refrain from doing so.

An employer, public safety officer, or labor organization may not engage in a lockout, sickout, work slowdown, strike, or any other organized job action that will measurably disrupt the delivery of emergency services and is designed to compel an employer, public safety officer, or labor organization to agree to the terms of a proposed contract.