There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

GREAT Act
Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize Federal grant reporting, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9074-9075)
09/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-947.
01/29/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/26/2018-7:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-7:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9074-9075)
09/26/2018-7:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4887.
09/26/2018-7:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9074-9076)
09/26/2018-7:11pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 738.
09/12/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-947.
02/06/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
02/06/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/29/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/29/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/29/2018 Referred to
02/06/2018 Markup by
09/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-947
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/27/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4887. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2018)

Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2018 or the GREAT Act

This bill requires the Office of Management and Budget, jointly with the executive department that issues the most federal grant awards, to: (1) establish government-wide data standards for information reported by grant recipients, (2) issue guidance directing federal agencies to apply those standards, and (3) require the publication of recipient-reported data collected from all agencies on a single public website.