There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Healthy Climate and Family Security Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To cap the emissions of greenhouse gases through a requirement to purchase carbon permits, to distribute the proceeds of such purchases to eligible individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/29/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/02/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/29/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/29/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/29/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/29/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/29/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/29/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/29/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/30/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/07/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/13/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/22/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/22/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/22/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/22/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/13/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/24/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/29/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment02/02/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/29/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4889. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2018)

Healthy Climate and Family Security Act of 2018

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to require the Department of the Treasury to establish a carbon trading program that caps the emissions of carbon dioxide (CO2) from crude oil, coal, and natural gas. Beginning in 2019, crude oil refineries, petroleum importers, coal mines, coal importers, and natural gas suppliers or processors must purchase carbon permits equivalent to the amount of CO2 that would be emitted by covered fuels. Treasury will auction these permits to those entities.

This bill establishes a declining cap on the quantity of permits issued to reduce CO2 emissions until 2050 when the permits issued represent an amount 80% below 2005 CO2 emission levels.

Treasury must issue permits for carbon capture and sequestration of CO2 from covered fuels.

This bill provides for the trading or sale of permits between entities, the banking by entities of permits for future years, and the borrowing by Treasury of permits from future years to stabilize permit prices.

Auction proceeds and penalties are returned to U.S. citizens lawfully present in the United States using the Healthy Climate Trust Fund established by this bill.

Treasury must impose fees on the import and pay fees for the export of carbon-intensive goods when the export country does not have equivalent measures to regulate greenhouse gases. Carbon-intensive goods are goods with an increased cost due to the regulation of greenhouse gases.

The Environmental Protection Agency must regulate within 10 years all sources of greenhouse gases that are anthropogenically emitted. This excludes gases attributable to the production of animals for food.