There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STOP School Violence Act of 2018
Student, Teachers, and Officers Preventing School Violence Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

STOP School Violence Act of 2018
Student, Teachers, and Officers Preventing School Violence Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the grant program for school security in the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/14/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 10 (Roll no. 106).(text: CR H1559)
01/30/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/15/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/14/2018-3:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2018-3:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 10 (Roll no. 106). (text: CR H1559)
03/14/2018-3:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1569)
03/14/2018-1:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/14/2018-1:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4909.
03/14/2018-1:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1559-1566)
03/14/2018-1:04pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/07/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/30/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/30/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (100)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/30/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/30/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/30/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 02/20/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/20/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/20/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/20/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 02/20/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 02/20/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/20/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 02/20/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/26/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/26/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/26/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/26/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/26/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 02/26/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/26/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/26/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/05/2018
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/05/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/05/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 03/05/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/05/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/05/2018
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/05/2018
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/06/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/06/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/06/2018
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 03/06/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 03/06/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/06/2018
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 03/06/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/06/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/06/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/06/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/06/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/06/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/06/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/07/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/07/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/07/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/07/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/07/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/07/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 03/07/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 03/07/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 03/07/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 03/07/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/07/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/07/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/07/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/07/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/07/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/07/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/07/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/08/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/08/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/08/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 03/08/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/08/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/09/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/09/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/09/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/09/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/09/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/13/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 03/13/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/13/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/13/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/13/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 03/13/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/14/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/14/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/14/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/14/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/14/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/30/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/07/2018 Referred to
Senate Judiciary03/15/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4909. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2018)

Student, Teachers, and Officers Preventing School Violence Act of 2018 or the STOP School Violence Act of 2018

This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to revise and reauthorize through FY2028 the Secure Our Schools grant program. This grant program provides grants to states, local governments, and Indian tribes to improve security, including the placement and use of metal detectors and other deterrent measures, at schools and on school grounds.