There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

IG Subpoena Authority Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

IG Subpoena Authority Act

Short Titles as Introduced

IG Subpoena Authority Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Inspector General Act of 1978 to provide testimonial subpoena authority, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9070)
06/29/2018Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-799.
02/02/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/26/2018-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9070)
09/26/2018-6:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4917.
09/26/2018-6:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9070-9072)
09/26/2018-6:55pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/29/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 618.
06/29/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-799.
02/06/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/06/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/02/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/02/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform02/02/2018 Referred to
02/06/2018 Markup by
06/29/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-799
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/27/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4917.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4917. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2018)

IG Subpoena Authority Act

This bill amends the Inspector General Act of 1978 to grant inspectors general subpoena authority to compel the attendance and testimony of witnesses. Inspectors general may not require by subpoena the attendance and testimony of any current federal employees, though they may use other authorized procedures.

To be issued, such a subpoena (1) must be approved by a panel comprised of three inspectors general of the Council of the Inspectors General on Integrity and Efficiency, and (2) must not be objected to by the Department of Justice.