There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Women and Climate Change Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To address the disparate impact of climate change on women and support the efforts of women globally to address climate change, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/09/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/05/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/05/2018
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/05/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/05/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/06/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/06/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/06/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/06/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/08/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/08/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/08/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/13/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/13/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/13/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/15/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/15/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/15/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/15/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/26/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/26/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/26/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/05/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/06/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/07/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/07/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/09/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/09/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/09/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/13/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/05/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/06/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/26/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/19/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/05/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/05/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/09/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4932.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4932. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/2018)

Women and Climate Change Act of 2018

This bill establishes a Federal Interagency Working Group on Women and Climate Change within the Department of State. The duties of the working group include: (1) coordinating the development of policies and activities of the federal government relating to addressing the effects of climate change on women, and (2) identifying and disseminating best practices for improved data collection relevant to the disparate impact of climate change on women.

The working group and the State Department's Office of Global Women's Issues must develop a strategy to prevent and respond to the effects of climate change on women.

The office must designate a Senior Coordinator for Women and Climate Change.